FL H2361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lotus House Education and Employment Program for High Special Needs Homeless Women and Youth.
Title
Lotus House Education and Employment Program for High Special Needs Homeless Women and Youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-09 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2361 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2361/BillText/Filed/PDF |