FL H2359 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Home Instruction for Parents of Preschool Youngsters (HIPPY).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Instruction for Parents of Preschool Youngsters (HIPPY)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-23HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-19HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-18HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-09HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback