FL H2355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 319A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 319A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Place of Hope's Child Welfare, Foster Care and Human Trafficking Prevention and Education Initiatives.
Title
Place of Hope's Child Welfare, Foster Care and Human Trafficking Prevention and Education Initiatives
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 319A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2355 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2355/BillText/Filed/PDF |