FL H2353 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Broward County Reclaimed Water Irrigation System for Topeekeegee Yungee Park.
Title
Broward County Reclaimed Water Irrigation System for Topeekeegee Yungee Park
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2353 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2353/BillText/Filed/PDF |