FL H2339 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Law Enforcement Crime Scene Investigation Training Initiative (LECSITI) at the CSI Academy of Florida.
Title
Law Enforcement Crime Scene Investigation Training Initiative (LECSITI) at the CSI Academy of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2339 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2339/BillText/Filed/PDF |