FL H2315 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Keys Aqueduct Authority Standby Power System Repair and Hardening.
Title
Florida Keys Aqueduct Authority Standby Power System Repair and Hardening
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Mooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1607A) |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-02-01 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |