FL H2289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1913)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1913)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Volusia County Williamson Road Widening.
Title
Volusia County Williamson Road Widening
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] | Rep. Patrick Henry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1913) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1913) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2289 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2289/BillText/Filed/PDF |