FL H2273 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Ormond Beach Reclaimed Water Storage Tank.
Title
Ormond Beach Reclaimed Water Storage Tank
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-01 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) | |
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-01 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-01 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-01 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-10-21 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Filed |