FL H2243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Ormond Beach Septic Tank Conversions for 76 Residences.
Title
Ormond Beach Septic Tank Conversions for 76 Residences
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2019-12-09 | House | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall -- Not Considered |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 9:30 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2243 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2243/BillText/Filed/PDF |