FL H2209 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Sarasota County Regional Fire/EMS Training Academy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sarasota County Regional Fire/EMS Training Academy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-12HouseReported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseFavorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseAdded to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2021-10-15HouseNow in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-15HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-10-15HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-13HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback