FL H2157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 372)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 372)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Are you OK? Mental Health on Blast!.
Title
Are you OK? Mental Health on Blast!
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 372) | |
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 372) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-15 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-12 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/2157 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/2157/BillText/Filed/PDF |