FL H2109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lauderdale Lakes Fire Station Renovation Project.
Title
Lauderdale Lakes Fire Station Renovation Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2109 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2109/BillText/Filed/PDF |