FL H2105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Security Funding for Jewish Day Schools.
Title
Security Funding for Jewish Day Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] | Rep. Mike Caruso [R] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] |
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Rep. David Silvers [D] | Rep. Richard Stark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 117) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2105 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2105/BillText/Filed/PDF |