FL H2089 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Brevard Reentry Portal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brevard Reentry Portal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-01 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-02HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2021-12-02HouseReported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2021-10-11HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-11HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-10-11HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-04HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback