FL H2079 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Winter Springs Gee Creek Stormwater Management Facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Winter Springs Gee Creek Stormwater Management Facility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseDied in Appropriations Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-11-13HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-11-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-09-25HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-09-18HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback