FL H2077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1747A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1747A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Leon County Orchard Pond Greenway Trail Phase II.
Title
Leon County Orchard Pond Greenway Trail Phase II
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1747A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2077 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2077/BillText/Filed/PDF |