FL H2061 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Seminole State College of Florida: Renovation of Building V.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seminole State College of Florida: Renovation of Building V

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseSee HB 5001 (line item 23)
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-09-12HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback