FL H2047 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Baptist Children's Home - Brave Moms Program.
Title
Florida Baptist Children's Home - Brave Moms Program
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Rep. Ross Spano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-08 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-10-11 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2047 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2047/BillText/Filed/PDF |