FL H2045 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Collier County Lake Park Blvd. Capital Improvements and Water Quality Flowway.
Title
Collier County Lake Park Blvd. Capital Improvements and Water Quality Flowway
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Rommel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1607A) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-16 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-01-24 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed |