FL H2039 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Starkey Trail at SR 54 Bicycle/Pedestrian Overpass.
Title
Starkey Trail at SR 54 Bicycle/Pedestrian Overpass
Sponsors
Rep. Ardian Zika [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2039 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2039/BillText/Filed/PDF |