FL H2031 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1921A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the 87th Avenue Ramp to Miami-Dade Expressway (MDX) 924.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

87th Avenue Ramp to Miami-Dade Expressway (MDX) 924

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-02 Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1921A)
2017-05-08HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 1921A)
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-16HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-03-15HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-03-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-01-23HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback