FL H1635 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-274

Summary

Adds one member to district governing board who will represent Walton County & be appointed by Walton County Commission; adds two board members who will represent Panama City Beach & be appointed by Panama City Beach City Council; provides terms for such members; provides for subsequent appointment procedures for such members; revises quorum requirement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Panama City-Bay County Airport & Industrial Dist.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-274
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01288
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00950; Read 3rd time -SJ 00950; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00950
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00872; Referred to Rules -SJ 00872
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00911; Read 3rd time -HJ 00911; Passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00911
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00762
2010-04-16 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-04-08 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00649; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00649
2010-04-06 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 04/08/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-04-05 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00482; Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00482

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback