FL H1625 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-270

Summary

Authorizes Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco to issue alcoholic beverage license to East Coast Zoological Society of Florida, Inc., for use within Brevard Zoo buildings & grounds; provides for payment of fee; provides for sale of beverages; provides for transfer of license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brevard County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-270
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01288
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00949; Read 3rd time -SJ 00950; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00950
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00872; Referred to Rules -SJ 00872
2010-04-23 In Messages
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00936; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1 -HJ 00936
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00913
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00648; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00648
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-26 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00410
2010-03-25 Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00410
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-17 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 00342; Now in Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC) -HJ 00342
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-11 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00267
2010-03-05 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00219

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback