FL H1593 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits shifting responsibility for paying ad valorem taxes of authority-owned properties used for private purposes to authority; provides exceptions for necessity of authority to obtain certain documentation to develop facilities or otherwise improve its facilities.
Title
Ocean Highway and Port Authority, Nassau County
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed |