FL H1581 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-15 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-15 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes doctor of medicine degree program at FAU.
Title
Florida Atlantic University [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Ambler [R] | Rep. Mary Brandenburg [D] | Rep. Adam Hasner [R] | Rep. Pat Patterson [R] |
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] | Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0058 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0840 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0840 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-15 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-88 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-23 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01033 | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00739; Was taken up -SJ 00750; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00750 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00718; Referred to Higher Education; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00718; Withdrawn from Higher Education; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00701; Substituted for SB 2460 -SJ 00701; Read 2nd time -SJ 00701 | |
2010-04-21 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00800; Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00800 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00777 | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00733; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00733 | |
2010-04-15 | On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00611; Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00611 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED), 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 12-H | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00407; Now in State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00407 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00258 | |
2010-03-02 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00143 |
Same As/Similar To
S2460 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00701; Substituted HB 1581 -SJ 00701; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1581 (Ch. 2010-88) -SJ 00701