FL H1569 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for providing financial statements to sponsor of charter school; provides requirements for designation as high-performing charter school; authorizes high-performing charter school to increase enrollment & receive capital outlay funds; authorizes newly approved charter school operated by high-performing education service provider to receive 15-year initial charter & become high-performing charter school, etc.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0976 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01070; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01070; CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 01070 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00963; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00963, -HJ 00966 | |
2010-04-17 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00760 | |
2010-04-16 | CS/CS/CS by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 -HJ 00733; CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -HJ 00731; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-15 | PCS on Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-31 | Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00448 | |
2010-03-30 | CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -HJ 00423; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-26 | CS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -HJ 00426 | |
2010-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-22 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00358 | |
2010-03-19 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-22 | CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -HJ 00357 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00359 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00258 | |
2010-03-02 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00142 |
Same As/Similar To
S1762 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |