FL H1565 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each agency, before adopting, amending, or repealing certain rules, to prepare statement of estimated regulatory costs of proposed rule if proposed rule has adverse impacts on small business or increases regulatory costs; provides exception to circumstances under which emergency rule shall not be effective, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rulemaking [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0027 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0949 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-05-28 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-29 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01287
2010-04-29 Read 3rd time -SJ 01054; CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 01054
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00933; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1844 -SJ 00933; Read 2nd time -SJ 00933
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00878; Referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00878
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01053; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01053; CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 01053
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00937; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00938
2010-04-20 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00790
2010-04-19 CS read 1st time on 04/19/10 -HJ 00760; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-16 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00763
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-04-01 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00477
2010-03-30 CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -HJ 00423; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-24 CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00426
2010-03-22 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/24/10, 8:00 am, 306-H
2010-03-10 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00258
2010-03-02 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00142

Same As/Similar To

H1537 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S1844 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932; Amendment(s) adopted (912852, 295630, 180196) -SJ 00932; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1565 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00933; Laid on Table -SJ 00933

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
012054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0120541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
012060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1565&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb156500.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb156501c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb156502c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb156503e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb156504e2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB15650426100949.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB15650429100027.html

Bill Comments

feedback