FL H1561 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Florida Attorney General to file suit challenging constitutionality of any individual health care mandate passed into law by Federal Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Health Care Legislation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Rules and Calendar Council
2010-03-23 Now in Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00380
2010-03-22 Favorable by Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 7 NAYS 5 -HJ 00380
2010-03-18 On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/22/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-10 Referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00258
2010-03-02 Filed; Introduced -HJ 00142

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback