FL H1555 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that lessees leasing certain aviation areas are exempt from ad valorem taxes; specifies that lessees that lease lands for aviation, airport, aerospace, maritime, or port purposes are exempt from ad valorem taxes.
Title
Ad Valorem Tax Exemptions for Lessees
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Harding [R] | Rep. John Snyder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1702 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1555 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1555/BillText/Filed/PDF |