FL H1553 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendment to s. 2, Art. I of State Constitution to eliminate authority granted to Legislature by constitutional amendment that at time of adoption in 1926 allowed Legislature to regulate or eliminate real property rights of individuals based on race or national origin, so that, as amended, Florida Constitution will state that all natural persons are equal before law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Basic Rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Rules and Calendar Council
2010-04-12 Favorable by Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00676; Now in Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00676
2010-04-08 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/12/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H
2010-03-10 Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00258
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00141
2010-03-01 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0084 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback