FL H1551 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides minimum requirements & specifications for training of medication technicians.
Title
Medication Technicians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#202 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-25 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1830 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
429 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |