FL H1547 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 262 (Ch. 2023-201), CS/CS/SB 1648 (Ch. 2023-262)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits officers or salaried employees of governmental entities from using their positions or state resources to make certain requests of social media platforms; prohibits governmental entities from initiating or maintaining certain agreements or working relationships with social media platforms; providing exceptions; prohibits controller from collecting certain consumer information; requires collectors to provide notice to consumers about data collection, sharing, & selling practices; provides consumers right to request data be disclosed, deleted, or corrected & to opt-in or opt-out of sale or sharing of data; provides social media protections for children; provides nondiscrimination measures, methods for requesting data & opting-in or opting-out of sale or sharing of data, private cause of action, & enforcement; preempts regulation of consumer date collection, sharing, & selling to the state; requires certain moneys to be deposited in Legal Affairs Revolving Trust Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology Transparency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-24 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02HouseLaid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 262 (Ch. 2023-201), CS/CS/SB 1648 (Ch. 2023-262)
2023-04-24HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-24HouseBill released to House Calendar
2023-04-24HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2023-04-24HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2023-04-23HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2023-03-31House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-31HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2023-03-31HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-31HouseOriginal reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-30HouseCS Filed
2023-03-30HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-30HouseReported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-03-29HouseFavorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-03-24HouseAdded to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-09HouseNow in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1549 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 262 (Ch. 2023-201), CS/CS/SB 1648 (Ch. 2023-262)
S262 (Similar To) 2023-06-07 - Chapter No. 2023-201, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1648 (Ch. 2023-262)
S1648 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-262, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 262 (Ch. 2023-201)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5011735Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Amendment/337587/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Amendment/713713/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Amendment/661209/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Analyses/h1547.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Analyses/h1547a.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Analyses/h1547b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Analyses/h1547c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Analyses/h1547z.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1547/Analyses/h1547z1.RRS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68139&IsPCB=0&BillId=78402
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=69563&IsPCB=0&BillId=78402

Bill Comments

feedback