FL H1533 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises purpose of FLVS to provide for development & delivery of blended learning; revises provisions relating to student priority, funding, reporting requirements, & examinations & assessments; provides for establishment of Florida Virtual School Justice Education Program; provides requirements for such program, including students participating in such program and FLVS, DOC, & DOE responsibilities; & revises definition of term "full-time equivalent student."
Title
Virtual Learning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1226 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |