FL H1531 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates Criminal Justice Standards & Training Commission as Public Safety Standards, Training, & Accreditation Commission; revises commission membership; requires cities & counties to create public safety departments; specifies divisions of such departments; limits when law enforcement officers may initiate traffic stops; provides for duties of law enforcement officers at accident scenes; provides for traffic monitors; specifies duties of traffic monitoring divisions; provides for crisis response teams; provides for public safety answering points.
Title
Local Law Enforcement Agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Omari Hardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6009 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
953 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1531 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1531/BillText/Filed/PDF |