FL H1527 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides personal property exemptions for medical debts; requires licensed facility to post information on its website regarding certain services; requires facility to establish patient grievance process; prohibits certain collection activities by facility.
Title
Health Care Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#615 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-25 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-04 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | PCS added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S296 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
222 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |