FL H1525 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law; revises liability insurance requirements for motor vehicle dealer applicants, recreational vehicle dealer license applicants, & motor vehicle owners or operators; revises financial responsibility requirements for owners or lessees of for-hire passenger transportation vehicles; revises requirements for motor vehicle liability insurance policies relating to coverage, & exclusion from coverage, for certain drivers & vehicles; revises minimum net worth requirements to qualify certain persons as self-insurers; specifies persons whom medical payments coverage must protect; specifies minimum medical expense limits; specifies coverage options that insurer is required & authorized to offer; revises insurance requirements for transportation network company drivers.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S150 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 2122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 06501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0652 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0653 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 727 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 72761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7278 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 739 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 748 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 749 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 8405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |