FL H1517 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-16 - Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Pending: House Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that motor vehicle dealers or mobile home dealers should apply for, rather than are required to obtain, certificates of title in name of purchasers; provides that certain applications relating to transfers of motor vehicles or mobile homes should, rather than must, be filed within certain timeframe; revises condition under which timeframe begins; removes authorization for certain penalties; revises grounds on which DHSMV may deny, suspend, or revoke motor vehicle dealer license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-16HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1346 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback