FL H1515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 170 (Ch. 2023-309)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 170 (Ch. 2023-309)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes courts to assess & award reasonable attorney fees & costs & damages in certain civil actions filed against local governments; specifies limitation on awards & restriction on fees & costs of certain litigation; provides certain procedures for continued meetings on proposed ordinances; provides duties of board of county commissioners & governing body of municipalities.
Title
Local Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 170 (Ch. 2023-309) |
2023-03-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-20 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S170 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Chapter No. 2023-309
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 2517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 0134 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |