FL H1511 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-16 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits retail thefts at multiple locations within specified period; provides exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Theft

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-16HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1534 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback