FL H1509 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to authorize installation of electric vehicle charging stations in rest areas on interstate highway system & to allow charging station providers to charge fee for public use of charging stations installed in such rest areas.
Title
Electric Vehicle Charging Stations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1332 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1509 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1509/BillText/Filed/PDF |