FL H1495 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies eligibility for certain nonviolent drug offenders to convert fines & fees into community service hours; specifies conversion rate; provides requirements for completion of community service hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonviolent Drug Offenders Converting Fines and Fees into Community Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-13HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-13HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2024-01-13HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2024-01-13HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2024-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1760 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
948016Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback