FL H1485 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises definitions relating to Public Transportation Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hillsborough County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0048 - Local Bills (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-265
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01287
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00948; Read 3rd time -SJ 00948; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00949
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00871; Referred to Rules -SJ 00871
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00909; Read 3rd time -HJ 00909; Passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00909
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00762
2010-04-16 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-17 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00342; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00342
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-10 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00257
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00133
2010-03-01 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2360 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1485 (Ch. 2010-265)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback