FL H1479 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes person developing residential or commercial property within unincorporated area of county to connect water, wastewater, & stormwater pipes, valves, & fixtures to pipes installed & operated by county under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pasco County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
2010-03-10 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00257
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00132
2010-03-01 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2762 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died, not introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback