FL H1465 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Hardee County Economic Development Authority to approve operating budget for specified purposes under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hardee County Economic Development Authority, Hardee County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#605 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HousePassed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (124679)
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-10HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-10HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-29HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-29HouseFavorable by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced
2020-01-21HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback