FL H1463 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals special act relating to Dunnellon Airport Authority; abolishes authority; transfers all assets & liabilities of authority to Board of County Commissioners of Marion County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dunnellon Airport Authority, Marion County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#56 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#508 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-02SenateReceived
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-26SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-03HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-03HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/03/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-29HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-29HouseFavorable by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-21HouseReferred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced
2020-01-17HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback