FL H1457 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes business to receive tax credit for project to conduct clean energy research in development within territory of John F. Kennedy Space Center; specifies credit amounts; requires business to apply to Space Florida for eligibility to receive tax credit; requires qualified applicant to receive credit to execute & deliver written agreement to Space Florida, etc.
Title
Advanced Clean Energy Development Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-29 | Now in Economic Development Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00425 | |
2010-03-26 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-29 | CS read 1st time on 03/29/10 -HJ 00415 | |
2010-03-25 | CS by Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00417 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Economic Development Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00131 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2578 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means