FL H1455 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-181
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-181
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits person from falsely representing himself or herself as member of or representing U.S. Armed Forces or National Guard for purpose of solicitation of charitable contributions or participation in charitable or sponsor sales promotion; prohibits person from wearing uniform of or any medal or insignia authorized for use by members or veterans of U.S. Armed Forces or National Guard, etc.
Title
Misrepresentation of Military Status [CPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0026 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Roll Call No. 0875 - Passage (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Roll Call No. 0875 - Passage (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-181 | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01287 | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01054; CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 01054 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Commerce; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00932; Substituted for CS/SB 1824 -SJ 00932; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932 | |
2010-04-23 | Received -SJ 00798; Referred to Commerce; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00798 | |
2010-04-22 | In Messages | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00860; CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0 -HJ 00860 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00807 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00611; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00611 | |
2010-04-02 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-28 | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00416; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-26 | CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00405 | |
2010-03-22 | CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00407 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, 404-H | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00131 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1824 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932; Substituted CS/HB 1455 -SJ 00932; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1455 (Ch. 2010-181) -SJ 00932
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0496 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 312 | New Code | See Bill Text |