FL H1445 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-16 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Pending: House Finance and Facilities Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands information that DMS or contractor providing dependent eligibility verification services may require from subscribers in order to establish dependent eligibility for state group insurance program enrollment; removes provision requiring Division of State Group Insurance & contractor to disclose to subscribers that dependent eligibility verification information may be subject to disclosure & inspection under public records laws; expands public records exemption for information collected by DMS to establish dependent eligibility; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Dependent Eligibility Verification Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-16HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1443 (Related) 2022-01-16 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S1662 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
S1660 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
S7026 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11012301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback