FL H1441 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida Museum of Black History Task Force within Division of Historical Resources of DOS; provides for appointment of task force members by Governor & Legislature; provides requirements for members of task force; requires task force to develop certain plans & recommendations; requires task force to submit report to Governor & Legislature before certain date; provides for expiration of task force; authorizes Legislature to consider commissioning, construction, operation, & administration of Florida Museum of Black History.
Title
Florida Museum of Black History
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#264 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#264 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Chapter No. 2023-72 | |
2023-05-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-02 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1606 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) |
2023-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-04-11 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-29 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-29 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-28 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-28 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-24 | House | PCS added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1441 (Ch. 2023-72)