FL H1439 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-16 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits operator of public lodging establishment or vacation rental from offering hourly rate for accommodation; requires guest of public lodging establishment or vacation rental to provide positive proof of identification to operator at time of occupancy; increases criminal penalties for soliciting or procuring another person to commit prostitution or other specified offenses or purchasing services of person engaged in prostitution; provides that human trafficking victim expunction of criminal history records does not apply to specified offenses; removes requirement for specific evidentiary standard when determining human trafficking victim status in absence of official documentation; creates Statewide Data Repository for Anonymous Human Trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution, Lewdness, Human Trafficking, and Public Lodging

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-16HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1441 (Related) 2022-01-16 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S772 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
S1852 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004343Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509098Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430583Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback